judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVID EUGENE HUBBARD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-235)
Case Number:06-235Case Docketed On:10/13/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DAVID EUGENE HUBBARD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DAVID EUGENE HUBBARD, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid Eugene HubbardGalen Bruce Woelk
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Eric Alan Johnson
Geoffrey Gunnerson
Jennifer Reece

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Criminal Law -Sentencing, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 12
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/13/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/13/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/13/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/26/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/26/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/26/2006Motion - Supplement the record - motion to take judicial notice and permit appellant to supplement recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
10/26/2006Memorandum - In support of motion to take judicial notice and permit appellant to supplement the recordMemorandumIn support of motionFinal
11/22/2006Order - Deny - motion to take judicial notice and permit appellant to supplement the recordOrderDenyFinal
01/02/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
02/16/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/21/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/05/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/09/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/18/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
05/18/2007Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Jennifer Reese and Geoffrey L. Gunnerson to appeal on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
05/31/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/31/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/04/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts and confidential folders.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/06/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Galen Woelk.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Eric A. Johnson to appear on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting. Eric A. Johnson will present argument on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/14/2007Event - Oral argument presented before full Court, Galen Bruce Woelk for the appellant; Eric Alan Johnson, Director, Prosecution Assistance Program and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
08/14/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/05/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/21/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/21/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/25/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 2/22/08 by C. Roybal.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal