judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NICKIE E. MILLS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0767
Short Caption:NICKIE E. MILLS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1181-09Filed Date:06/18/2010

Opening Event Date:06/18/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/11/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/27/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNickie E. Mills Y
James W. KleinNY
Jessica Brand NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Suzanne C. NylandNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/18/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/06/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
07/08/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
08/11/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (413pgs/Hunt) 5/17-18/10 proc.
08/11/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (163pgs/Graybill by Van Bremen) 5/19/10 proc.
08/11/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (117pgs/Graybill by Van Bremen) 5/20/10 proc.
08/11/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (38pgs/Graybill by Van Bremen) 5/21/10 proc.
08/11/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (17pgs/Tape) 6/2/10 proc. w/CD included
08/11/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/13/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
08/17/2010RECORD INDEX
08/17/2010RECORD COPIES
08/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (Pretrial Services report filed 5/16/09) ****SEALED
09/22/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
10/05/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before December 21, 2010. (By: JAC)
12/21/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo)
12/28/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 21, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
03/21/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo)
03/30/2011ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 20, 2011. No further requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (By: ETW)
06/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 90 days
07/01/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE and stay brfing in Clara Mills appeal pending filing of N. Mills brief.
08/10/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion to dismiss appeal, denied as moot appellant's motion for an exension of time to file the brief and denied as moot appellee's motion to consolidate appeals
08/10/2011FiledDismissed
08/10/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal w/waiver attached (Appellant)Granted
09/27/2011FiledMandate