judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SEAN A. BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0766
Short Caption:SEAN A. BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Lead:10-CF-0766Consolidated: 12-CO-0686
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-26407-09Filed Date:06/21/2010

Opening Event Date:06/21/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/16/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/09/2012
Argued/Submitted:03/05/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/18/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Jay Apperson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/21/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/13/2010RECEIVED Affidavit from Appellant regarding the denial of his 6th Amendment Rights.
07/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that David Woll, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/20/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) David Woll, Esquire
08/12/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
08/18/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (267-pgs/shelton 4/12-14/10 proc.)
08/18/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (14-pgs/tape 6/18/10 proc.)w/cd attached
09/10/2010RECORD INDEX
09/10/2010RECORD COPIES
09/10/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (pre-trial services re- port - filed 12/15/09--SEALED)
09/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (5 pgs/tape) 4/29/10 proc. cd attached
09/16/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/22/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/29/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 2/1/11. no oppo '
11/03/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before February 1, 2011. (JAC)
11/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (4 pgs/tape) 3/4/10 proc.
11/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (18 pgs/tape) 3/17/10 proc. w/cd
01/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 3, 2011 (no oppo)
02/02/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 3, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
04/19/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until July 6, 2011 (no oppo)
05/03/2011 ORDERED that the motion for stay is hereby held in abeyance for 90 days to permit the trial court to rule on the pending motion. It is F/O that appellant shall advise this court on or before August 1, 2011, as to the status of the motion in he trial court. (ETW)
07/20/2011FiledStatement regarding re 23-110 status (Appellant)
10/13/2011FiledStatement regarding status of 23-110 motion pending in Sup Crt (Appellant)
02/02/2012FiledOrder Denying Appellant's motion to stay
02/02/2012FiledBriefing Order
03/08/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
03/13/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
06/05/2012FiledInitial Order in appeal no. 12-CO-686
06/05/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals nos. 10-CF-766 & 12-CO-686
06/05/2012FiledAppointing Counsel/CJA David Carey Woll, Esquire in appeal no. 12-CO-686 (Appellant)
06/20/2012FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant)
08/09/2012FiledSupplemental Record - #7 (65pgs/Coney) 5/4/12 proc. w/CD
08/09/2012FiledRecord Copies (12-CO-686)
08/09/2012FiledRecord Index (12-CO-686)
10/02/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
10/10/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
10/10/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/10/2012FiledGRANT -Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 11/9/12, and appellant's lodged brief and limited appendix are filed.
11/09/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
11/09/2012FiledBriefing Completed
12/05/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
12/05/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/06/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
12/13/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
01/31/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/05/2013FiledArgued Before Judge Oberly,Beckwith,Steadman, David Carey Woll Esq.,for appellant, Jay Apperson Esq., for appellee.
06/26/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
07/09/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
07/18/2013FiledMandate