judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WIIDEMAN (RANDAL) VS. JUSTICE COURT

Case Information: 34726
Short Caption:WIIDEMAN (RANDAL) VS. JUSTICE COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34699
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - CV998741Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/26/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/26/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07984
10/21/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-10273
11/16/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-11254
11/16/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/22/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 17, 1999. 99-11254