judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NORBERT ROBERT SCHULTZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-229)
Case Number:06-229Case Docketed On:10/10/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:NORBERT ROBERT SCHULTZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:NORBERT ROBERT SCHULTZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantNorbert Robert SchultzRonald G. Pretty
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Eric Alan Johnson
Geoffrey Gunnerson
Hiliary Wilson
Brian J. Hunter

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 162
Citation:169 P.3d 81

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/10/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/10/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/10/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/10/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/16/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/20/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/22/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/07/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/08/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/22/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/23/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/10/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
05/10/2007Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Hiliary Wilson and Geoffrey Gunnerson to appear on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
05/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Ronald PrettyNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/04/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts & confidential folder; Volume III, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/05/2007Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Brian J. Hunter, Student Intern, to appear on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
06/06/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Brian J. Hunter, Student Intern, for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/12/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Ronald G. Pretty for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General, Eric A. Johnson, Director, PAP, and Brian J. Hunter, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Hunter for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/12/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/17/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/02/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/02/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/07/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 11/6/07 by C. Roybal.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal