Case: 12-04-00235-CR
12-04-00235-CR
07/16/2004
Revocation of Probation
Roy Lee Boswell
The State of Texas
No
7th Court of Appeals
07/26/2004
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/31/2004 | Record due | | |
07/29/2004 | Docketing Statement Due | | |
07/26/2004 | Case stored | | |
07/26/2004 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | | |
07/19/2004 | Welcome to the court letter | | |
07/16/2004 | Notice of appeal received | | |
07/12/2004 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
07/02/2004 | Date Sentence Given in Open Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/26/2004 | CASE TRANSFERRED TO OTHER COURT | Transferred to another Court of Appeals |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Mr. Michael J. West |
Boswell, Roy Lee | Criminal - Appellant | Mr. Richard Kennedy |
Trial Court Information
114th District Court
Smith
Honorable Cynthia S. Kent
241-1410-00
10 Years/TDCJ-ID & $500 Fine