Case: 14-04-01037-CV
14-04-01037-CV
10/29/2004
Other Personal Injury
Hang Anthony Tran and Lich Thuy Hoang
Equivest Properties Inc., Trustee
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/11/2014 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||
07/06/2006 | Misc motion DISPOSED | DENIED | | ||
06/29/2006 | Mandate Issued | | |||
06/29/2006 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||
06/23/2006 | Misc Motion filed | | |||
06/05/2006 | No Pettition for Review FILED | | |||
06/05/2006 | Petition for Review DUE | | |||
05/05/2006 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |||
05/05/2006 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |||
04/20/2006 | Memorandum opinion issued | AFFIRMED AS MODIFIED |
| ||
11/10/2005 | Submitted | | |||
10/07/2005 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||
05/19/2005 | Mtn.Lv.file amend.brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | Extension of time to file GRANTED and document received is ordered filed | | ||
05/19/2005 | Amended brief FILED - ANT,APE,APP,STA, | | |||
05/09/2005 | Amended brief RECEIVED - ANT,APE,APP,STA | | |||
05/09/2005 | Mtn.Lv.FILE amended brief - ANT,APE,APP | | |||
04/22/2005 | Supplemental clerk's record FILED-ANT,APE,STA | | |||
03/21/2005 | Appellee's brief DUE | | |||
03/18/2005 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
03/18/2005 | Case ready to be set | | |||
03/14/2005 | Letter RECEIVED | | |||
03/04/2005 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |||
03/03/2005 | Reporters record FILED - ANT,APP,STA | | |||
03/01/2005 | Extend time to file court reporter record DISPOSED | DENIED AS MOOT | | ||
02/24/2005 | Extend time to file court reporter record FILED | | |||
02/17/2005 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
02/11/2005 | Supplemental clerk's record FILED-ANT,APE,STA | | |||
02/11/2005 | Supplemental clerk's record FILED-ANT,APE,STA | | |||
02/03/2005 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | | ||
02/02/2005 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |||
01/28/2005 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
01/03/2005 | No Reporter's Record TAKEN | | |||
12/15/2004 | Reporter's Record Due | | |||
11/30/2004 | No Reporter's Record in Civil case FILED | | |||
11/23/2004 | Docketing statement DUE | | |||
11/23/2004 | Mediation Docketing Statement DUE | | |||
11/22/2004 | Mediation Docketing Statement FILED | | |||
11/22/2004 | Reporter's Record Due | | |||
11/22/2004 | Record due | | |||
11/09/2004 | Clerk's record FILED - APP,STA | | |||
11/08/2004 | Court fee due | | |||
11/08/2004 | Notice for Docketing Statement FILED | | |||
11/08/2004 | Clerk's NOA Filed | | |||
10/29/2004 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||
10/22/2004 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |||
04/26/2004 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/11/2014 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Equivest Properities Inc., Trustee | Appellee | Peter Scaff Jeremy C. Martin |
Bang Anthony Tran and Lich Thuy Hoang | Appellant | Tuananh Mai |
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 3
Harris
Honorable LYNN M. BRADSHAW-HULL
786,926