judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SPARKS (LOUIS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36228
Short Caption:SPARKS (LOUIS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 48502
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C112033Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/06/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/06/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for an Extension of Time to file Notice of Appeal. Appellant's Proper Person Motion for Consideration of Direct Appeal or in the Alternative, Release from Custody. 00-09541
07/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Dismissing Action. This is a proper person motion for consideration of direct appeal or in the alternative, release from custody. " . . . we deny appellant's motion." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-12155
08/09/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13820
08/09/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 3, 2000. 00-13820