judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PINE BAR RANCH, LLC; and OWEN C. TORREY, MARGERY TORREY, and ELLEN TORREY v. HOMER L. LUTHER and HELEN P. LUTHER and THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF FREMONT, DOUGLAS L. THOMPSON, GARY JENNINGS, PAT HICKERSON, LANNY APPLEGATE, and T. CROSBY ALLEN, II, in their official capacities as COMMISSIONERS OF THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF FREMONT COUNTY

Case Heading (06-108)
Case Number:06-108Case Docketed On:05/18/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Highways (Title 24)
Short Title:PINE BAR RANCH, LLC; and OWEN C. TORREY, MARGERY TORREY, and ELLEN TORREY v. HOMER L. LUTHER and HELEN P. LUTHER and THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF FREMONT, DOUGLAS L. THOMPSON, GARY JENNINGS, PAT HICKERSON, LANNY APPLEGATE, and T. CROSBY ALLEN, II, in their official capacities as COMMISSIONERS OF THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF FREMONT COUNTY
Full Title:PINE BAR RANCH, LLC; and OWEN C. TORREY, MARGERY TORREY, and ELLEN TORREY, Appellants (Cross-Petitioners/Respondents), v. HOMER L. LUTHER and HELEN P. LUTHER, Appellees (Petitioners), and THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF FREMONT, DOUGLAS L. THOMPSON, GARY JENNINGS, PAT HICKERSON, LANNY APPLEGATE, and T. CROSBY ALLEN, II, in their official capacities as COMMISSIONERS OF THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF FREMONT COUNTY, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPine Bar Ranch, LLCDavid B. Hooper
Tom A. Glassberg
AppellantOwen C. TorreyDavid B. Hooper
Tom A. Glassberg
AppellantMargery TorreyDavid B. Hooper
Tom A. Glassberg
AppellantEllen TorreyDavid B. Hooper
Tom A. Glassberg
AppelleeHomer L. LutherPaul J. Hickey
Roger Fransen
Brandi Lee Monger
Joel M. Vincent
AppelleeHelen P. LutherPaul J. Hickey
Roger Fransen
Brandi Lee Monger
Joel M. Vincent
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Fremont County, WyomingEdward L. Newell II
AppelleeDouglas L. ThompsonEdward L. Newell II
AppelleeGary JenningsEdward L. Newell II
AppelleePat HickersonEdward L. Newell II
AppelleeLanny ApplegateEdward L. Newell II
AppelleeT. Crosby Allen IIEdward L. Newell II

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 35
Citation:152 P.3d 1062

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/18/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/18/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/18/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/18/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/29/2006Brief - Appellants (different types of delivery to counsel)BriefAppellantFinal
08/11/2006Brief - Appellees; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
08/14/2006Service - Certificate of service (amended)ServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
08/16/2006Notice-Internal - Other case matured, no brief filed by appellees County CommissionNotice-InternalOtherFinal
08/22/2006Brief - Appellants replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/22/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from district court clerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/29/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Administrative Record; Volume III, TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/11/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/18/2006Event - Oral argument presented before full court (David B. Hooper for appellants; Joel M. Vincent and Paul J. Hickey, argument by Mr. Hickey for appellees) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
10/18/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/02/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/20/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/20/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal