St Vs James B Chadwell | § § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Chadwell, James B | ||||
41044 Gunter Court Eagles Point Peru, IN 46970 | |||||
State Plaintiff | State of Indiana | Bruce Carter Embrey
765-863-1188(W) | |||
Charges: Chadwell, James B | Citation | Statute | Level | Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | PUBLIC INTOXICATION- | 3277 | 7.1-5-1-3 | Misdemeanor Class B | 09/06/2003 |
2. | PUBLIC INTOXICATION- | N/A | 7.1-5-1-3 | Misdemeanor Class B | 09/06/2003 |
Bonds | |||||||||||||||||||
|
09/15/2003 | Converted Event docket level comment: 600.00 | ||
---|---|---|---|
09/15/2003 | Converted Event Information filed. Defendant bonded out with an Initial Hearing set for Thursday, September 18, 2003 at 1:00 p.m. ss (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/15/2003 | ||
09/18/2003 | Converted Event Calendar: INITIAL HEARING (Time: 13:00:00) (Judge: C01) | ||
09/18/2003 | Converted Event Comes now the Defendant in person and comes now the State of Indiana by Brent Davis. Defendant advised of rights and enters a not guilty plea. Pre-Trial and omnibus date set for October 22, 2003 at 1:00 P.M. and Trial set for November 14, 2003 at 9:00 A.M. tll (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 09/18/2003 | ||
10/22/2003 | Converted Event Calendar: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE (Time: 13:00:00) (Judge: C01) | ||
10/24/2003 | Converted Event Pre-Trial Conference held. Change of Plea to be taken on the trial date of November 14, 2003 at 9:00 A.M. tll (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 10/22/2003 | ||
11/14/2003 | Converted Event Calendar: GUILTY PLEA (Time: 09:00:00) (Judge: C01) | ||
11/14/2003 | Judgment 1. PUBLIC INTOXICATION- Finding of Guilty | ||
11/14/2003 | Judgment 2. PUBLIC INTOXICATION- Dismissed | ||
11/19/2003 | Converted Event Defendant appears, State appears by Brent Davis. Defendatn withdraws former plea of not guilty and enters a plea of guilty to Count #1. Count #2 is dismissed. Court finds defendant guilty and sentences him to the MCJ for 180 days. Sentence suspended except for time served of 1 actual day. Placed on probation for 179 days. Rules of Probation filed. Alcohol/Drug evaluation. Fine $300.00 CC $134.00 ADM fee of $50.00 Initial PSF $50.00 and $20.00 monthly. Public Defender withdrawn. Bond applied toward fees and costs. JUDGMENT ON FINDING bb (DISPOSED: GP ) (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 11/14/2003 | ||
05/27/2004 | Converted Event Probation Department, by Cathy Gustin, files Notice of Probation Violation. Defendant ordered to appear in the Probation Department on June 2, 2004, at 1:30 p.m. Service by Sheriff. bb PV RET'D NO SERVICE bb (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 05/26/2004 | ||
06/16/2004 | Converted Event Probation Department, by Cathy Gustin, files Motion to Set Hearing, together with Certificate of Service. bb (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 06/16/2004 | ||
06/18/2004 | Converted Event Motion To Set Hearing APPROVED. Probation Violation hearing in this matter set for Thursday, July 1, 2004 at 1:00 P.M. Notice ordered. jg (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 06/18/2004 | ||
06/22/2004 | Converted Event Probation Department, by Cathy Gustin, files Motion to Dismiss Probation Violation. bb (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 06/22/2004 | ||
06/23/2004 | Converted Event Court grants Motion to Dismiss Probation Violation. Hearing is lifted for July 1, 2004. bb (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 06/23/2004 | ||
08/27/2010 | Converted Event All documents associated with this case have been scanned and attached to this file in accordance with the County Weeding Policy. ls (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 08/27/2010 |
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
52C01-0309-CM-000360 | Chadwell, James B | 09/15/2003 Miami Circuit Court | CM - Criminal Misdemeanor Decided |
|