Case: D-1432
D-1432
08/22/1991
App Writ of Error
JOE T. BOYD
TEXAS BOARD OF CHIROPRACTIC EXAMINERS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/10/1991 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
08/22/1991 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/14/1991 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | No Rehearing Filed | | |
10/09/1991 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | | |
10/04/1991 | MET to file reply disposed of | Filing granted | reply was received and filed on 9-10-91 second motion | |
09/12/1991 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
09/10/1991 | Reply to Response | | | |
08/30/1991 | MET to file reply disposed of | Filing granted | reply due 9-9-91 | |
08/22/1991 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
11/14/1991 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BOYD, JOE T. | Petitioner | The Honorable Susan Larsen |
TEXAS BOARD OF CHIROPRACTIC EX | Respondent | Ms. Jennifer S. Riggs Mr. Dan Morales |
Court of Appeals Information:
08-90-00292-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 06-12-91
8th Court of Appeals
Honorable JERRY WOODARD
Trial Court Information
238th District Court
Midland
B-36,505