judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARVIN L. HOLT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0819
Short Caption:MARVIN L. HOLT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Sentencing Issues only
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL8825-92Filed Date:07/01/2010

Opening Event Date:07/01/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/22/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/28/2010
Argued/Submitted:02/01/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/11/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarvin L. Holt YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Suzanne Clement Libby YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/01/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 1, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
07/22/2010RECORD INDEX
07/22/2010RECORD COPIES
07/22/2010RECORD COMPLETED
07/26/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
08/24/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
08/24/2010APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
09/28/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
09/28/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
10/07/2010FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
12/16/2010CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
02/01/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/01/2011SUBMITTED to Judges Thompson,King,Blackburne- Rigsby.
02/17/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Thompson, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.)
03/11/2011MANDATE ISSUED