judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EDWARD MICHAEL BANKS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0806
Short Caption:EDWARD MICHAEL BANKS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Bail Reform Act
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-21564-09Filed Date:06/30/2010

Opening Event Date:06/30/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/04/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/14/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/11/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/16/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEdward BanksY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Travis A. Hill YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/30/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Michelle Bonner, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/20/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Michelle Bonner, Esquire
08/27/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (no oppo)
08/27/2010RECEIVED - statement regarding transcripts
09/07/2010ORDERED that appellant's motion for leave is granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged statement regarding transcript. F/O sua sponte, that the appointment of Michelle Bonner, Esquire, is hereby vacated, and R. Michael Labelle, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant herein. Michelle Bonner, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to newly-appointed counsel forthwith. (ETW)
09/07/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
10/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (51 pgs/Rogers) 5/27/10 proc. a.m.
11/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (82 pgs/Price) 5/27/10 proc. p.m.
11/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (7 pgs/tape) 6/16/10 proc. cd attached
11/04/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/09/2010RECORD INDEX
11/09/2010RECORD COPIES
11/10/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/20/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 2/23/11 no oppo
12/23/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before February 23, 2011. (JAC)
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 60 days. no oppo
02/25/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 22, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
04/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 5/23/11
04/29/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 23, 2011. No further re quests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause.(ETW)
05/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 6/6/11. no oppo
06/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF no oppo
06/07/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief w/appdx.
06/14/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time w/in which to file the brief, and the unopposed motion of appeallant for leave to file the lodged brief and appendix, it is ORDERED that the motions are granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief and appendix. It is F/O that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of the order. (ETW)
06/14/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/14/2011APPENDIX
07/14/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/14/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/10/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/11/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, Schwelb
01/24/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
02/01/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
02/16/2012FiledMandate