judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION v. RICHARD A. JOHNSON

Case Heading (S-07-0106)
Case Number:S-07-0106Case Docketed On:05/11/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION v. RICHARD A. JOHNSON
Full Title:STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellant (Respondent/Objector), v. RICHARD A. JOHNSON, Appellee (Petitioner/Claimant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich
AppelleeRichard A. JohnsonGeorge Santini

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2008 WY 59
Citation:185 P.3d 16

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/11/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/11/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/25/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/25/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
08/02/2007Event - Phone Call - received call from counsel for appellee regarding appellant's designation of record. Counsel did not have an index from clerk and could not tell what had been designated. The designation is improper.EventPhone CallFinal
08/02/2007Event - Phone Call - contacted secretary for Ms. Radosevich and explained that the designation was improper and that documents in the district court record must be designated, not just attached to notice of appeal. Suggested that they file an amended proper designation.EventPhone CallFinal
08/03/2007Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/06/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record. (Appellee)Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/06/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (Appellant)Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/13/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/22/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/27/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency RecordRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
06/02/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/20/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/27/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal