judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BONHAM VS. PAWN MANAGEMENT

Case Information: 36229
Short Caption:BONHAM VS. PAWN MANAGEMENTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9901916Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/09/2000 / Cohen, LarrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/06/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Stephen C. Moss--check no. 01139.
06/06/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09571
06/09/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Larry J. Cohen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/28/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 28, 2000. 00-15105
10/20/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. First Supplemental Report. The Settlement Judge plans to confer with each of the attorneys between now and November 1st. 00-18631
02/11/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Second and Final Supplemental Report. Settlement Judge refers this matter back to the Court for further formal litigation. 02-02699
02/22/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file the docketing statement. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellants). 02-03401
03/08/2002Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 02-04258
05/09/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellants have failed to file either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested. Appellants shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the required document. 02-08130
05/14/2002Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 02-08456
06/24/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal. 02-10886
07/02/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 02-11295
07/02/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.