Case: 08-0641
08-0641
08/12/2008
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
URI COHEN
DELORES HAWKINS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/20/2008 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response filed on behalf of Delores Hawkins (orig & 11) | |
09/10/2008 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | Appendix attached to pet/rev. | |
09/10/2008 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of Uri Cohen. | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/28/2009 | Case Stored | G02 Row 1 E-5 | | |
01/05/2009 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Certified copy of order of Supreme Court sent to the Court of Appeals | | |
11/21/2008 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Filing dismissed as moot | RSP's 'motion to compel dismissed as moot | |
11/21/2008 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
10/20/2008 | Response to Petition | Response filed on behalf of Delores Hawkins (orig & 11) | | |
10/16/2008 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | To pet's atty, Ms. Lana Dieringer to notify her that we are returning her Ck.#8556 for $10 that she sent with her response to resp's motion. There is no fee for a response. | | |
10/16/2008 | Response to Motion filed | Petitioner's response to resp's motion to compel (orig & 11) | | |
10/14/2008 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
10/13/2008 | Call received | From Mr. Sylvester Anderson, atty for resp, inquiring as to his mo and how long does it take for the Court fo rule on a petition. | | |
10/06/2008 | Miscellaneous Motion | RSP's 'motion to compel petitioner to serve petition for review on respondent' (12) filed on behalf of Delores Hawkins. | | |
09/26/2008 | Letter Filed | Letter from respondent's attorney, Mr. Sylvester Anderson, stating that he has not received a copy of the petition for review from petitioner's atty., Ms. Lana Dieringer (1) | | |
09/22/2008 | Additional Copies received | Rec'd (signed) original copy of pet/rev. On behalf of Uri Cohen. (1) | | |
09/15/2008 | Call received | From Ms. Lana Dieringer in re: $125 fee and original of petition. She is going to try to send them F.E. today. | | |
09/11/2008 | Call received | From Ms. Dana Dieringer in re: $125 fee and signed original. She will be sending them in Federal Express. | | |
09/10/2008 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | To pet atty's office, Dieringer Law Firm, left message in re: $125 fee and signed original. | | |
09/10/2008 | Appendix Filed | Appendix attached to pet/rev. | | |
09/10/2008 | Petition for Review | On behalf of Uri Cohen. | | |
08/20/2008 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | M/e/t to file pet/rev is granted. Pet/rev is due September 10, 2008. | |
08/14/2008 | Response to Motion filed | Response to 53.7 (12) filed on behalf of Delores Hawkins. | | |
08/12/2008 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | PET's m/e/t to file pfr (12) filed on behalf of Uri Cohln. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
01/28/2009 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02 Row 1 E-5 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Hawkins, Delores | Respondent | Mr. Sylvester Anderson |
Cohen, Uri | Petitioner | Ms. Lana R. Dieringer |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-07-00043-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 1]
___ SW3d ___, 04-15-08
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable Adele O. Hedges
Trial Court Information
334th District Court
Harris
Honorable Sharon Sue McCally
2004-36442