judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANES VS. BRINTON C/W 34613

Case Information: 31694
Short Caption:ANES VS. BRINTON C/W 34613Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:31694*, 34613 Related Case(s): 34495 , 34613
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A351559
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A352711
Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/29/1998 / Apfelberg, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/20/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Netzorg & Cashette-check no. 5609.
01/20/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day (docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
01/29/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert S. Apfelberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/02/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. To Court Reporter: Tom Mercer & Associates.
02/04/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 6/2/97. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer & Associates.
02/04/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
02/06/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Transcript of Proceedings.
08/10/1998Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued.
01/19/1999Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. Copy of letter from Settlement Judge Apfelberg to attorneys requesting status of proceedings.
02/08/1999Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. Copy of letter from Settlement Judge Apfelberg dated 2/8/99 re: status of proceedings.
03/04/1999Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. Apfelberg. This matter is continued until April 30, 1999. Mailed on: 3/2/99.
08/20/1999Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. Apfelberg. Re: status of settlement negotiations (nos. 31694/32910/32912/32913).
10/08/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 10/14/99.
06/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We consolidate the above-entitled matters for all appellate purposes. Because the parties to these appeals have not filed stipulations to dismiss these appeals, it appears that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of these matters. The parties shall have 10 days from the date of this order to object to our understanding that the parties failed to reach a settlement of these appeals. If no objection is made, appellants/cross-respondents and respondents/cross-appellants in Docket No. 34495 and appellants in Docket No. 34613 shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a docketing statement. Upon the filing of the docketing statements, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of these consolidated appeals. Appellants/cross-respondents and respondents/cross-appellants in Docket No. 34495 and appellants in Docket No. 34613 shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file with this court a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request. We establish the following parallel briefing schedules for these three consolidated appeals and cross-appeal. Appellants in each of these consolidated appeals shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve an opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing in each appeal shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellants/cross-respondents and respondents/cross-appellants in Docket No. 34495 and appellants in Docket No. 34613). Nos. 31694, 34495, 34613. 00-09814
06/26/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. Filed in 34495 only. (Nos. 31694, 34495 and 34613.)
06/26/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. Filed 34495 only. (Nos. 31694, 34495 and 34613.)
06/26/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Filed in 34613 only. (Nos. 31694, 34495 and 34613.)
06/26/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Filed for Appellant/Cross-Respondent in 34495 and Appellant in 34613 only. (Nos. 31694, 34495 and 34613.)
06/28/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing (Docketing Statement). Nos. 31694, 34495, 34613. Doc. No. 00-11049
07/06/2000Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. Objection to Docketing Statement of Appellants Anes (nos. 31694/34495/34613). 00-11511
08/07/2000Other Other. Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal (no. 34613) for Lack of Jurisdiction. Nos. 31694/34495/34613. Doc. No. 00-13618
08/18/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal (no. 34613) for Lack of Jurisdiction. Nos. 31694/34495/34613. Doc. No. 00-14463
08/25/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter (pursuant to NRAP 27(a)), Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. Nos. 31694/34495/34613.
09/06/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Request for Permission to File A Reply to the Opposition Filed by the Appellants (nos. 31694/34495/34613). 00-15670
09/06/2000MotionReceived Reply to Response. Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction (nos. 31694/34495/34613). 00-15671
09/07/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy. (Nos. 31694, 34495 and 34613). 00-15725
10/06/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellants' Allen Anes, Eileen Anes and Allen Anes or Eileen Anes, Trustees of the Anes Family Trust, Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 10/06/00 (Reno/Carson). Nos. 31694,34495 & 34613. 00-17777
10/06/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellants' Allen Anes, Eileen Anes and Allen Anes or Eileen Anes, Trustees of the Anes Family Trust Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 11. Nos. 31694, 34495 & 34613. 00-17778
10/11/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Respondents' Flangas and AF Properties. Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Respondent's Answering Brief (nos. 31694/34495/34613). 00-17953
10/17/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Respondent/Appellant Albert A. Flangas' Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Respondent's Answering Brief and Countermotion to Dismiss Flangas' Appeal No. 34613 Pursuant to NRAP 31 (C) (nos. 31694/34495/34613). 00-18377
10/26/2000MotionFiled Motion. Request for Permission to File a Reply to Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Respondent's Answering Brief and Opposition to Counter-Motion to Dismiss Flangas' Appeal No. 34613 Pursuant to NRAP 31(C). (nos. 31694/34495/34613). 00-18978
10/26/2000MotionFiled Reply to Response. Reply to Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Respondent's Answering Brief and Opposition to Counter-Motion to Dismiss Flangas' Appeal No. 34613 Pursuant to NRAP 31(C). (nos. 31694/34495/34613). 00-18984
11/06/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. Respondents' Flangas and AF Properties. Nos. 31694/34495/34613. 00-19487
11/08/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief of Stewart Title of Nevada, Inc. and Stewart Title Guaranty Co. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 11/6/00. (Nos. 31694, 34495 and 34613). 00-19615
11/08/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent's Appendix to Stewart Title of Nevada and Stewart Title Guaranty's Answering Brief (Volume R1). (Nos. 31694, 34495 and 34613). 00-19617
12/07/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Stipulation for Extension of Time to file Appellants' Reply Brief to Repsondent Stewart Title Guaranty and Stewart Title of Nevada's Answering Brief. Brief due: December 14, 2000. (Nos. 31694, 34495 and 34613). 00-21359
12/08/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Order Dismissing Appeal in Docket No. 34495 and Order to Show Cause in Docket Nos. 31694 and 34613. These are consolidated appeals. fn1[We grant the Flangases' request for permission to file a reply to the Aneses' opposition to the Flangases' motion to dismiss, filed September 6, 2000. We direct the clerk of this court to detach and file the Flangases' reply, received on September 6, 2000.] fn2[We defer ruling on the Aneses' motion to dismiss in Docket No. 34613 pending further jurisdictional review of these consolidated appeals.] The Aneses shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why their appeal in Docket No. 31694 should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in Docket No. 31694 shall be suspended pending further order of this court. We conclude that we lack jurisdiction over the appeal and cross-appeal in Docket No. 34495. We grant the Flangases' motion to dismiss, and ' . . . order the appeal and cross-appeal dismissed.' The Flangases shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why the appeal in Docket No. 34613 should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in Docket No. 34613 shall be suspended pending further order of this court. fn3[In light ouf our order suspending the briefing schedule, we defer ruling on the Flangases' motion for extension of time to file the opening brief and answering brief, filed October 11, 2000.] Nos. 31694, 34495, 34613. 00-21483
12/08/2000MotionFiled Reply to Response. Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. 00-15671
12/08/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returned Unfiled Respondents'/Cross-Appellants' Robert B. Brinton; Brinton Incorporated; Robert B. Brinton, Trustee of the Robert B. Brinton Separate Property Trust, Answering Brief and Opening Brief. See Order filed 12/08/00. Nos. 31694, 34495 & 34613.
12/26/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant/Respondents' Petition for Rehearing (No. 34495). Mailed on: 12/22/00--Fed Ex. (Also entered in nos. 31694 and 34613 in response to this court's Order to Show Cause filed 12/8/00) 00-22486
01/02/2001MotionFiled Motion. Appellants/Respondents' Motion to File Exhibits to Petition for Rehearing (nos. 31694/34495/34613). 01-00058
01/03/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Amended Certificate of Mailing of Petition for Rehearing - Nos. 31694/34495/34613. 01-00130
01/03/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Amended Certificate of Mailing of Motion to File Exhibits to Petition for Rehearing - Nos. 31694/34495/34613. 01-00131
01/22/2001Other Other. Filed Appellants' Albert A. Flangas, Individually and d/b/a AF Properties and Investments Notice of Non-Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 31694/34495/34613. 01-01441
05/03/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. To Clark County Clerk to transmit certified documents; "Order of Dismissal (Certain Causes)" and "Notice of Entry of Order" in 31694. Nos. 31694/34613.
05/03/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsReceived Documents from District Court Clerk. Received Copies of Order of Dismissal and Notice of Entry of Orderin 31694 (received by fax). Nos. 31694/34613.
05/22/2001Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Granting Motions to Involuntarily Dismiss Certain Plaintiffs' Causes of Action filed in district court on January 24, 2000. Placed in correspondence file no. 34613 only. Nos. 31694/34613. 01-08576
05/22/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: January 26, 2001. Placed in correspondence file 31694 only. Nos. 31694/34613. 01-08577
05/22/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Order Denying Rehearing (No. 34495) and Dismissing Appeals (Nos. 31694 and 34613.) ' . . . we deny rehearing in Docket No. 34495, and dismiss the appeals in Docket Nos. 31694 and 34613.' fn2[We deny as moot the Aneses' motion and countermotion to dismiss appeal filed in Docket No. 34613. In addition, we deny as moot Flangas/AF Properties' motion, filed October 11, 2000, for extension of time to file the opening brief and answering brief.] fn3[We grant the Aneses' unopposed motion to file exhibits to their rehearing petition.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML. Nos. 31694/34495/34613. 01-08581
06/19/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08693
06/19/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/05/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 22, 2001. 01-08693