judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SUSAN J. MILLER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-259)
Case Number:06-259Case Docketed On:11/08/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:SUSAN J. MILLER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:SUSAN J. MILLER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSusan J. MillerJames H. Barrett
Sean Hays Barrett
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Cara Boyle Chambers

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/08/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/08/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/08/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/08/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/19/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief - appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/30/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/31/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/28/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Karen A. ByrneMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
02/28/2007Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel - Karen A. ByrneOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
02/28/2007Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - James H. Barrett on behalf of appellant.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
03/22/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/23/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellant (1st extension for new counsel)OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/20/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/20/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellant (2nd extension for new counsel)OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/17/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/03/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
07/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/27/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, seven volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, jury instructions and verdict; Volume III, transcripts; Volumes IV-VI, exhibits; Volume VII, confidential file.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Cara Boyle Chambers on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/17/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
08/17/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
08/17/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/17/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/21/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal