Case: 05-95-01744-CV
05-95-01744-CV
12/08/1995
Miscellaneous civil
Chambers, Ken and Evelyn Chambers, Individually and as Next Friends of Bradley Chambers
City of Lancaster, Lancaster Police Officer Everett Powell, Lancaster Police Officer Jimmy Miller, The City of Desoto, Desoto Police Officer William H. Ransom, and Desoto Police Officer C.P. Bentley
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/27/2016 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
01/14/2016 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
07/30/1997 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||
03/21/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |||
03/21/1997 | Mandate Issued | | |||
01/20/1997 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||
11/21/1996 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/21/1996 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/17/1996 | Response due | | |||
11/07/1996 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |||
05/10/1996 | MattConv | | |||
05/06/1996 | Letter Filed | | |||
04/15/1996 | Brief Filed | | |||
04/01/1996 | Letter Filed | | |||
03/21/1996 | Letter Filed | | |||
03/13/1996 | Settle/Not Settle - ADR Report Due | | |||
02/12/1996 | ADR Referral Order Issued | Referred to Mediation | | ||
01/29/1996 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
01/29/1996 | Motion for Leave to File | | |||
01/28/1996 | MattConv | | |||
01/11/1996 | MattConv | | |||
12/29/1995 | Record due | | |||
12/29/1995 | Transcript Filed | | |||
12/08/1995 | Civil Appeals Information Sheet Filed Appellant | | |||
12/08/1995 | Civil Appeals Information Sheet Filed Appellee | | |||
12/08/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
11/27/1995 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |||
09/19/1995 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |||
08/31/1995 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/27/2016 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Chambers, Ken And Evelyn Chamb | Appellant | David R. Weiner Thomas J. Stutz |
City Of Lancaster, Lancaster P | Appellee | Nisha P. Byers Robert G. Hogue Randall R. Kucera |
City Of Desoto, William H. Ran | Appellee | Paul F. Schuster |
Trial Court Information
44th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Candace G. Tyson
87-5151-B