Case: 14-07-00757-CR
14-07-00757-CR
09/12/2007
Burglary of a Habitation
Stevaughn Andre Brown
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/04/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
03/10/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/28/2011 | Letter filed | | |||
10/15/2008 | Case stored | | |||
10/15/2008 | Mandate issued | | |||
10/06/2008 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||
09/02/2008 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||
08/15/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | GRANTED | | ||
08/15/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals | | |||
08/07/2008 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||
07/23/2008 | Letter filed | | |||
07/23/2008 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||
07/08/2008 | Memorandum opinion issued | AFFIRMED |
| ||
06/10/2008 | Submitted | | |||
06/05/2008 | Letter filed | | |||
05/08/2008 | Motion disposed | DENIED | | ||
04/29/2008 | Motion filed | | |||
04/29/2008 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||
04/09/2008 | State brief due | | |||
04/04/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||
04/04/2008 | Case ready to be set | | |||
03/10/2008 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||
03/10/2008 | Appellants brief due | | |||
02/15/2008 | Response due | | |||
02/14/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED | | ||
02/12/2008 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
02/05/2008 | Notice of late brief | | |||
01/31/2008 | Appellants brief due | | |||
12/20/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED | | ||
12/14/2007 | Response due | | |||
12/13/2007 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
12/04/2007 | Notice of late brief | | |||
11/28/2007 | Appellants brief due | | |||
11/08/2007 | Reporters record due | | |||
10/29/2007 | Reporters record filed | | |||
10/10/2007 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | GRANTED | | ||
10/09/2007 | Fax received | | |||
10/09/2007 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||
10/08/2007 | Reporters record due | | |||
10/08/2007 | Record due | | |||
09/20/2007 | Clerks record filed | | |||
09/12/2007 | Trial court clerks certification of record requested | | |||
09/12/2007 | Court reporters information sheet sent | | |||
09/12/2007 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||
09/06/2007 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||
08/07/2007 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/15/2033 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | April Silva |
Brown, Stevaughn Andre | Criminal - Appellant | Stevaughn Andre Brown Terrence A. Gaiser |
Trial Court Information
351st District Court
Harris
Honorable MARK K. ELLIS
1091701
7 yrs TDC