judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

QUON VS. MILLER

Case Information: 32757
Short Caption:QUON VS. MILLERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A387650Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/30/1998 / Goldberg, AubreySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/28/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert C. Maddox & Associates--check no. 10659).
07/28/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
07/30/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Aubrey Goldberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/04/1998MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Injunction during the Pendency of Appeal.
08/04/1998ExhibitFiled Exhibits (copies). Exhibits, Volumes 1 through 3.
08/10/1998MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Injunction during the Pendency of Appeal.
08/13/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
08/20/1998MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Request for Permission to Respond to Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Injunction during the Pendency of the Appeal.
09/08/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We have considered appellant's motion for an injunction pending appeal, which we treat as a motion for a stay. We are not persuaded that a stay is warranted at this time. We deny appellant's motion. fn1[We also deny appellant's request to file a reply brief under NRAP 27(a). We have noted the points made in her request.]
10/16/1998Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
11/12/1998Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
11/30/1998Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.
11/30/1998AppendixReceived Appendix. Supplement to Appendix. (No action necesssary. Motion for Stay denied on 9/8/98).
03/12/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 12, 1999.
04/15/1999MotionFiled Stipulation.
05/05/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. We elect to treat the second stipulation as a joint motion, and we grant the motion. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to serve and file the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
09/30/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal.
09/30/1999MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal with Prejudice.
12/06/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." fn1[Appellant's motion for voluntary withdrawal of the appeal, filed on the same day as the stipulation to dismiss, is denied as moot.]The parties to bear their own costs and attorneys fees. SNP/CLK 00-21281
12/06/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.