Case Heading (06-110) | |||||
Case Number: | 06-110 | Case Docketed On: | 05/19/2006 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Certiorari | ||
Short Title: | STEPHEN ARTHUR HAMEL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | STEPHEN ARTHUR HAMEL, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent. |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Petitioner | Stephen Arthur Hamel | Pro Se |
Respondent | The State of Wyoming | Patrick J. Crank Paul S. Rehurek D. Michael Pauling |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
05/19/2006 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
05/19/2006 | Petition - Writ - certiorari for restoration of petitioner's direct appeal (AG's office not served - sent copy this date) | Petition | Writ - certiorari | Final | |
05/19/2006 | Motion - In forma pauperis | Motion | In forma pauperis | Final | |
06/06/2006 | Order - Petition for review - granting, in part (Sixty days to hold remand hearing) | Order | Petition for review - grant | Final | |
08/04/2006 | Event - Phone Call from Donna Domonkos re remand hearing. At hearing district attorney informed Judge and parties that he would not participate, Attorney General's office not serve to appear and it is their case | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
08/04/2006 | Notice-Internal - Other, received notification by e-mail that Chief Justice has extended time another 60 days | Notice-Internal | Other | Final | |
10/04/2006 | Event - Phone Call to Judge Grant's chambers, hearing was held on October 2 and they are waiting on attorneys to submit order. They will send us a copy when filed | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
10/26/2006 | Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Findings of fact and conclusions of law | Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies | Findings of fact and conclusions of law | Final | |
11/07/2006 | Order - Petition for review - deny | Order | Petition for review - deny | Final | |
11/07/2006 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
11/20/2006 | Service - Mail returned "Return to Sender" | Service | Mail returned | Final |