judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL R. BILECKY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0809
Short Caption:MICHAEL R. BILECKY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD1726-10Filed Date:06/28/2010

Opening Event Date:06/28/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/27/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael R. Bilecky Y
Michael Alan Olshonsky NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/19/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (By: JAC)
09/02/2010ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
09/02/2010DISMISSED
09/27/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived