judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

S. E. STINNETT, ET UX. v. CITY OF WACO

Case: A-76
A-76
02/25/1944
Application for Writ of Error
S. E. STINNETT, ET UX.
CITY OF WACO
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/22/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/04/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
02/25/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/22/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/17/1944Affidavit filed
03/08/1944Document received (See Remarks)
03/04/1944Response to Petition
02/25/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/25/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
S. E. Stinnett, et ux.Petitioner
City of WacoRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information