judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LACEY (WILLIAM) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36230
Short Caption:LACEY (WILLIAM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34675 , 35475
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR5045Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/09/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/07/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/07/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-09625
07/13/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: on or before July 17, 2000. 00-12030
07/17/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: March 20, 21, 22, 23, 2000; May 31, 2000; July 2, 2000. Court Reporter: Anita Filmore. Filed in district court on: July 3, 2000. 00-12295
07/17/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-12296
07/18/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: March 21, 22, & 23, 2000; July 3, 2000. Court Reporter: Anita C. Fillmore. 00-12388
07/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 30 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 00-12835
08/31/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-15384
09/08/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order. 00-15848
09/20/2000MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File Fast Track Statement in Excess of Ten (10) Pages. 00-16653
09/20/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Include Hearing Transcript as a Supplement to Appellant's Appendix. 00-16655
09/20/2000Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. 00-16656
09/20/2000AppendixReceived Appendix. 00-16657
09/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On September 20, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a motion for leave to file a fast track statement in excess of 10 pages. The clerk shall file the fast track statement provisionally submitted on September 20, 2000. On September 20, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a motion for leave to include the hearing transcript as a supplement to appellant's appendix. The clerk of this court shall file the appendix provisionally submitted on September 20, 2000. 00-16822
09/25/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-16656
09/25/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-16657
10/10/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Application for Stay of Judgment and Bail Pending Appeal. 00-17856
10/16/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: October 23, 2000. 00-18266
10/20/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Application for Stay of Judgment and Bail Pending Appeal. 00-18678
10/23/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second request) 00-18755
10/25/2000MotionFiled Motion. Request for Submission of Application for Stay of Judgment and Bail Pending Appeal and Request for Expedited Decision. 00-18849
10/30/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has moved this court for a stay of judgment and bail pending appeal. The State opposes the motion. We grant the motion, and we remand this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of entering an order granting bail and setting an appropriate bail pending appeal. fn1[On October 25, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a request for submission of this motion and an expedited decision. The motion is granted.] All of the transcripts were filed by court reporter Anita Fillmore on July 18, 2000, with the exception of the sentencing transcript, which Fillmore informs this court she did not report. Counsel for appellant shall, within 5 days of this order, file a rough draft transcript request form for the sentencing hearing transcript, and serve the request on the court reporter who reprted the proceeding and within 10 days of this order, file in this court 2 file-stamped copies of the rough draft transcript request form. The motion of October 23, 2000 is granted. The fast track response shall be filed on or before November 22, 2000. 00-19008
11/06/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 00-19485
11/22/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Third Request). 00-20596
11/28/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Fourth Request) 00-20801
12/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 30, 2000, this court entered an order directing appellant's counsel to request a rough draft transcript of the sentencing hearing. On November 6, 2000, appellant filed a response that the hearing had already been transcribed. Because the hearing has been transcribed, no rough draft transcript request is necessary. Appellant attached a copy of the transcript to the response. The clerk shall file the transcript for inclusion with the appendix. The motions are granted to file the fast track response. The fast track response shall be filed within 5 days of the date of this order. No additional extensions shall be granted. 00-22549
12/27/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Judgment and Sentencing May 31, 2000. Court Reporter: Tonja D. Lemich. 00-22550
01/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track response has been filed. Counsel for respondent shall file and serve the fast track response within 5 days of this order or show cause why counsel for respondent should not be sanctioned. 01-01506
01/30/2001MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. 01-02008
02/02/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track response and appendix provisionally submitted on January 30, 2001. 01-02202
02/02/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-02010
02/02/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. Volumes I through IV. 01-02012
03/29/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief due: 40 days. fn1[The parties need not file a new appendix and may utilize the fast track appendix filed. If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party shall file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] fn2[We suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 01-05494
05/10/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 05/08/01. 01-07854
05/10/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Supplement to Appellant's Appendix. 01-07855
06/08/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: July 11, 2001. 01-09593
07/11/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Second Request. 01-11773
07/16/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed July 11, 2001. Respondent's answering brief shall be served and filed on or before July 25, 2001. 01-11938
07/25/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Third request) 01-12634
07/26/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed July 25, 2001. Respondent's answering brief shall be served and filed on or before July 31, 2001. 01-12642
08/02/2001MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. 01-13093
08/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed August 2, 2001. The clerk shall file the 54 page answering brief received on August 2, 2001. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to serve and file a reply brief. 01-13750
08/13/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 7/31/01. 01-13094
09/19/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-15839
09/24/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed September 19, 2001. Appellant's reply brief shall be served and filed on or before October 16, 2001. 01-16067
10/15/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-17366
10/17/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed October 15, 2001. Appellant shall have to and including November 6, 2001, to file and serve the reply brief. No further extensions ot time shall be permitted in the absence of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 01-17506
11/08/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Third Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief. 01-18697
11/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed November 8, 2001. Appellant shall have until November 13, 2001, to file and serve the reply brief. 01-18811
11/15/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 11/13/01. 01-19084
02/15/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Lyon County Clerk regarding Transmission for Transcripts for hearings conducted on January 10-11, 2000. Due date: 10 days.
02/15/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We note that both the answering brief and reply cite to "AAII." Although it appears that this citation refers to appellant's appendix volume II, no such volume was filed with this court. Appellant shall have until February 20, 2002, to file a coy of "AAII" with this court. 02-03020
02/15/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On February 2002, we entered an order directing appellant to file "AAII" by February 20, 2002. Further review of the documents filed with this court indicates that the necessary document was filed with this court on September 25, 2000. We vacate our February 15, 2002, order. 02-03075
02/19/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: January 10th & 11th, 2000. Court Reporter: Anita C. Fillmore. 02-03188
04/09/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-06222
04/09/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP02-MS/RR/NB
06/04/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Wes Williams in place and stead of Cheri K. Emm as counsel for appellant. (Both attorneys are with the law firm of Williams & Emm.) 02-09731
07/10/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-11730
08/06/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-11863
08/06/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/09/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 7, 2002. 02-11863