judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD B. OSBORN v. RUSSELL KILTS

Case Heading (06-9)
Case Number:06-9Case Docketed On:01/09/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Property
Short Title:RICHARD B. OSBORN v. RUSSELL KILTS
Full Title:RICHARD B. OSBORN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. RUSSELL KILTS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard B. Osborn Pro Se
AppelleeRussell KiltsRick L. Koehmstedt

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2006 WY 142
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/09/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/09/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/09/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/09/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/22/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/23/2006Notice-Incoming - Other. Filed "fraud upon court" - per Chief Justice no action taken and not distributed to court.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/28/2006Motion - Other. Motion to void judgment of district court case 80843A.MotionOtherFinal
04/10/2006Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/12/2006Response/Objection - Motion. Combined objection and memorandum of points and authorities in opposition to appellant's motion to vacate judgment; and received copy of designation of record on appeal of appellee.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
04/17/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/18/2006Order - Denying motion to void judgment of district court. (order awarded costs ot appellee - statement to be filed within 10 days)OrderDenyFinal
04/21/2006Motion - Strike appellee's late filings.MotionStrikeFinal
04/21/2006Response/Objection - Motion. Appellant's reply to appellee's combined objection and memorandum of points and authorities in opposition to appellant's motion to vacate judgment.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
04/27/2006Notice-Incoming - Statement of attorney's fees and costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
04/28/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/01/2006Motion - Strike. Motion to strike statement of attorney's fees and costs.MotionStrikeFinal
05/02/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/04/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volumes I & II, original papers; Volume III, transcripts; Volume IV, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/04/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/09/2006Order - Other. Filed order awarding attorney's fees and costs to appellee.OrderOtherFinal
05/09/2006Order - Denying motion to stike.OrderDenyFinal
11/06/2006Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming and awarding costs to appellee. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/15/2006Notice-Incoming - Statement of attorney's fees and costs.Notice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
11/21/2006Petition - Reinstatement. Appellant's petition for reinstatement.PetitionReinstatementFinal
12/04/2006Response/Objection - Petition - general. Respondent's objection to petition for reinstatement and memorandum of points and authorities.Response/ObjectionPetition - generalFinal
12/12/2006Order - Denying petition for reinstatement.OrderDenyFinal
12/12/2006Order - Sanction - other. Order awarding attorney's fees and costs as sanction.OrderSanction - otherFinal
12/12/2006Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/12/2006Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/12/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/12/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/14/2006Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal