Case: PD-1096-91
PD-1096-91
09/24/1991
PDR Case Type
COX, GARY DALE, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/06/1991 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
11/20/1991 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
11/20/1991 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
10/25/1991 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
09/24/1991 | PDR FILED | | |
09/24/1991 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/19/1991 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John C. Vance |
COX, GARY DALEJR. | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Stanley I. Weinberg |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-89-01221-CR
REV & REM 8-13-91
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No 10
Dallas
Honorable Randall Isenberg
MA88-04078-L