Case: AP-72,201
AP-72,201
10/24/1995
Appeal Case Type
BUCHANAN, EX PARTE DAVID LAIRD
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/08/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process | | |
12/08/1995 | MANDATE ISSD | | |
11/22/1995 | REHEAR DISP | DENIED | |
11/22/1995 | REHEAR DISP | DENIED | |
11/07/1995 | REHEAR FILED HC | | |
11/07/1995 | REHEAR FILED | | |
10/25/1995 | OPINION ISSD | HC Relief granted | |
10/25/1995 | OPINION ISSD | HC Relief granted | |
10/24/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process | | |
10/24/1995 | WRIT FILED | | |
10/24/1995 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process | | |
10/24/1995 | SET FOR SUBMIS | | |
10/24/1995 | SUBMITTED | | |
10/24/1995 | WRIT FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/09/1999 | STORED | CASE STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BUCHANAN, EX PARTE DAVID LAIRD | Applicant | David L Buchanan |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John C. Vance |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-94-00087-CR
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 3 of Dallas County
Dallas
Honorable MARK TOLLE
W90-34851-J (A)