Case: 14-05-00915-CV
14-05-00915-CV
08/26/2005
Other Personal Injury
James Randel and Nancy Patterson , as Next Friends of Haley Patterson and Garrett Patterson
City of Alvin
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/11/2014 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||
10/26/2006 | Mandate Issued | | |||
10/24/2006 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||
09/29/2006 | No Pettition for Review FILED | | |||
09/29/2006 | Petition for Review DUE | | |||
08/30/2006 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |||
08/30/2006 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |||
08/15/2006 | Memorandum opinion issued | AFFIRMED |
| ||
03/07/2006 | Submitted | | |||
03/02/2006 | Reply Brief Filed | | |||
03/02/2006 | Motion to file reply briefDISPOSED-ANT,APE,REL,RES | Extension of time to file GRANTED and document received is ordered filed | | ||
02/28/2006 | Reply Brief Received | | |||
02/28/2006 | Motion to file reply brief FILED - ANT,APE,REL,RES | | |||
02/16/2006 | Reply Brief Filed | | |||
02/15/2006 | Reply brief DUE | | |||
02/09/2006 | Motion to file reply briefDISPOSED-ANT,APE,REL,RES | GRANTED | | ||
02/01/2006 | Motion to file reply brief FILED - ANT,APE,REL,RES | | |||
01/26/2006 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||
01/23/2006 | Appellee's brief DUE | | |||
01/13/2006 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
01/13/2006 | Case ready to be set | | |||
01/05/2006 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | | ||
01/02/2006 | Appellee's brief DUE | | |||
12/29/2005 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
12/22/2005 | Misc motion DISPOSED | GRANTED | | ||
12/12/2005 | Misc Motion filed | | |||
12/12/2005 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
12/08/2005 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |||
12/01/2005 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | | ||
11/21/2005 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
11/18/2005 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |||
11/09/2005 | Response due | | |||
11/03/2005 | Ext. time to file Notice of Appeal DISPOSED | GRANTED | | ||
10/31/2005 | Reporter's Record Due | | |||
10/27/2005 | Ext. time to file notice of appeal | | |||
10/20/2005 | Order Entered | | |||
10/19/2005 | Letter RECEIVED | | |||
10/19/2005 | No Reporter's Record TAKEN | | |||
10/14/2005 | No Reporter's Record in Civil case FILED | | |||
10/14/2005 | Clerk's Record DUE | | |||
09/21/2005 | Clerk's record FILED - APP,STA | | |||
09/20/2005 | Ext. time to file Clerk's Record DISPOSED | GRANTED | | ||
09/20/2005 | Ext. time to file Clerk's Record FILED | | |||
09/19/2005 | Mediation Docketing Statement DUE | | |||
09/19/2005 | Docketing statement DUE | | |||
09/16/2005 | Docketing Statement FILED | | |||
09/16/2005 | Mediation Docketing Statement FILED | | |||
09/13/2005 | Reporter's Record Due | | |||
09/13/2005 | Mediation Docketing Statement FILED | | |||
09/13/2005 | Record due | | |||
09/02/2005 | Clerk's NOA Filed | | |||
09/02/2005 | Notice for Docketing Statement FILED | | |||
09/02/2005 | Court fee due | | |||
08/26/2005 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||
08/18/2005 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |||
07/15/2005 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/11/2014 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Raleigh Patterson, a/n/f of Minor Children Haley Patterson and Garret Patterson | Appellant | Thomas K. Kruppstadt Geoffrey Scott Binney |
City of Alvin, Alvin Police Department and Scott Elliott | Appellee | William S. Helfand Norman Ray Giles |
Trial Court Information
239th District Court
Brazoria
Honorable PATRICK EDWARD SEBESTA
33071