judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GLENN MCCUTCHEN V. DARNISE DAVIS

Case Information: 10-FM-0815
Short Caption:GLENN MCCUTCHEN V. DARNISE DAVISClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB3021-07Filed Date:06/25/2010

Opening Event Date:06/25/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/03/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/24/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGlenn Mccutchen NPro SeN
AppelleeDarnise Davis NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/25/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/16/2010 On consideration fo the notice of appeal filed in this case on June 25, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index/or record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11(b)(3)(A). (dlm)
08/03/2010RECORD INDEX
08/03/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/05/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
09/23/2010 On consideration of this court's order of August 5, 2010, directing petitioner to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
10/19/2010RECEIVED - Motion for leave to file brief late (Did not comply w/rule 27, not enough copies. Sent back)
10/19/2010RECEIVED - Aplt's brief w/appdx (No certificate of service, not enough copies. Sent back)
10/19/2010RECEIVED - statement regarding transcript (not required for this appeal)
11/03/2010ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
11/03/2010DISMISSED
11/24/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived