judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GARY W. VOLLAN v. WYOMING BOARD OF DENTAL EXAMINERS

Case Heading (06-275)
Case Number:06-275Case Docketed On:12/01/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Professions and Occupations (Title 33)
Short Title:GARY W. VOLLAN v. WYOMING BOARD OF DENTAL EXAMINERS
Full Title:GARY W. VOLLAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. WYOMING BOARD OF DENTAL EXAMINERS, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGary W. VollanW. Keith Goody
AppelleeBoard of Dental ExaminersPatrick J. Crank
Michael L. Hubbard
Ryan T. Schelhaas
Kennard F. Nelson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Procedure
Opinion Number:2007 WY 132
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/01/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/01/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/01/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/01/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/07/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/20/2007Brief - Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
02/22/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/13/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Filing of recordNotice-IncomingFiling of recordFinal
03/16/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes: Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/19/2007Event - Phone Call - district court clerk indicated that she had put wrong case number on transmitted record - corrected on case file.EventPhone CallFinal
08/16/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/04/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/04/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/10/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 9/6/07.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal