Case: 05-03-00858-CV
05-03-00858-CV
06/02/2003
Miscellaneous civil
Lowe, Sherrie R.
Watersong Villas Apartments, & BNC Real Estate
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/25/2004 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/25/2004 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/04/2004 | Opinion to Publishers | | |
06/01/2004 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
05/17/2004 | Notice Filed | | |
05/07/2004 | Rehearing Due | | |
05/05/2004 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
04/23/2004 | Mot-Ext to File Rehear Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/22/2004 | Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing | | |
04/07/2004 | Record Retention | Destroy | |
04/07/2004 | Memorandum Opinion | Affirmed | |
04/07/2004 | Memorandum Opinion | Affirmed | |
04/06/2004 | Submitted | | |
04/06/2004 | Submission | | |
04/06/2004 | Submitted | | |
01/26/2004 | Submission | | |
12/03/2003 | Order Entered | Strike | |
11/26/2003 | Amended Brief Filed | | |
11/19/2003 | Amended Brief Filed | | |
11/06/2003 | Reply Brief Filed | | |
10/24/2003 | Brief Due | | |
10/24/2003 | Brief Filed | | |
10/24/2003 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/24/2003 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/13/2003 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/10/2003 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |
10/10/2003 | Brief Due | | |
10/10/2003 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
09/22/2003 | Record Returned | | |
09/17/2003 | Record Checked Out | | |
09/15/2003 | Motion for Relief Filed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
09/10/2003 | Brief Due | | |
09/10/2003 | Brief Filed | | |
09/10/2003 | Motion for Relief Filed | | |
08/28/2003 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/27/2003 | Brief Due | | |
08/27/2003 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
08/11/2003 | Record Checked Out | | |
08/04/2003 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |
07/28/2003 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
07/27/2003 | Record due | | |
07/25/2003 | Record Checked Out | | |
07/22/2003 | Letter Filed | | |
07/21/2003 | Letter Filed | | |
07/12/2003 | Response due | | |
07/07/2003 | Letter Filed | | |
07/02/2003 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
07/02/2003 | Motion to Accelerate Appeal Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
06/30/2003 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
06/20/2003 | Jurisdictional Brief Filed | | |
06/13/2003 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
06/12/2003 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
06/12/2003 | Order Entered | | |
06/11/2003 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |
06/09/2003 | Motion to Accelerate Appeal Filed | | |
06/02/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
06/02/2003 | Affidavit Filed | | |
06/02/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
06/02/2003 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
05/30/2003 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | | |
04/09/2003 | Motion for New Trial Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/06/2010 | Status | Destroy record |
08/25/2004 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Watersong Villas Apartments | Appellee | Robert D. Ramage |
Alexander N. Beard | Appellee | Alexander N. Beard |
Sherrie R. Lowe | Appellant | Sherrie R. Lowe |
Stephanie Finch | Appellee | Ms. Stephanie Ann Finch |
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Mary L. Murphy
02-04596