Case: 03-0475
03-0475
06/02/2003
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE RONALD L. BISSELL
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/08/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
10/07/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
06/16/2003 | Reply to Response | Relator | relator's reply to real party in interest's response | |
06/11/2003 | Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed | Respondent | real party in interest's response to pet. for writ of mandamus | |
06/02/2003 | Appendix Filed | Relator | appeandix attached | |
06/02/2003 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Relator | On behalf of Ronald L. Bissell | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/08/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
10/07/2020 | Brief from database | Refer to file-stamped date on the document for the actual file date. | ||
08/06/2003 | Case Stored | G02/25-A-2 | | |
06/16/2003 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Denied | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
06/16/2003 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Denied | Petition for writ of mandamus on behalf of Ronald L. Bissell is denied. Stay order issued June 2, 2003 is lifted. | |
06/16/2003 | Reply to Response | relator's reply to real party in interest's response | | |
06/16/2003 | Stay Order lifted | Stay order issued June 2, 2003 is lifted. | | |
06/11/2003 | Case Record Filed | real party in interest's record | | |
06/11/2003 | Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed | real party in interest's response to pet. for writ of mandamus | | |
06/11/2003 | Supplement to Clerk's/Reporter's Record | real party in interest's supplemental reporter's record (3) 1 for 11-27-00, 1 for hearing 11-21-02 and 1 for hearing 04-10-03 | | |
06/06/2003 | Response to Motion filed | Relator's resp. to real party in interest's emergency motion to reconsider order granting temp. relief | | |
06/04/2003 | Miscellaneous Motion | Emergency motion to reconsider order granting temporary relief filed on behalf of Suzette Y. Bissell | | |
06/04/2003 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Denied | Real Party in Interest's emergency motion to reconsider order granting temporary relief is denied. Stay order issued Jun. 2, 2003 remains in effect. | |
06/02/2003 | Motion for temporary relief | Relator's motion for temporary relief | | |
06/02/2003 | Motion for temporary relief disposed | Filing granted | The motion for temporary relief in the following petition for writ of mandamus is granted. Stay order issued and response requested June 12, 2003 by 5 p.m. | |
06/02/2003 | Appendix Filed | appeandix attached | | |
06/02/2003 | Case Record Filed | Record to the mandamus (1) | | |
06/02/2003 | Court reporter/recorder's record | Relator's reporter's record (1) | | |
06/02/2003 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | On behalf of Ronald L. Bissell | | |
06/02/2003 | Stay Order issued | Stayed the TC order of 4/30/03; request response n/l/t June 12, 2003. | | |
06/02/2003 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response is due n/l/t 5:00 pm on 6/12/03 mlbx rule d/n/a | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/06/2003 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02/25-A-2 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BISSELL, RONALD L. | Relator | Mr. E. Link Beck Mr. Richard R. Orsinger |
BISSELL, LAUREN | Other interested party | Ms. Daisy Everhart |
BISSELL, SUZETTE Y. | Respondent | Mr. David R. McClure Mr. John P. Mobbs Mr. Jack W. Marr |
Court of Appeals Information:
08-03-00257-CV
Denied
109 SW3d 87, 05-29-03
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
383rd District Court
El Paso
2000-CM 6652