Case: 95-0740
95-0740
08/02/1995
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, ROBERT J. CRIMMINS, HARRY P. KAMEN, FRANK LYNCH, RICHARD MANDEL, CHARLES SAHNER, STEVEN F. BRANTON, WAYNE GUEST, and JERE CHANDLER
THE FIRST COURT OF APPEALS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/08/1995 | Relator's reply brief on the merits | Relator | "Relator's surreply in further support of their petition for writ of Mandamus and application for emergency relief" | |
08/07/1995 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/09/1995 | BRIEFS MISSING WHEN CASE STORED ARE FOUND | Original of all briefs | | |
09/08/1995 | Case Stored | No Mo/Re filed | | |
09/08/1995 | list missing briefs when case is separated(remarks | Original of all briefs | | |
08/08/1995 | Motion for temporary relief disposed | Overruled | M/L/F Pet Mand overruled; Motion for temporary relief overruled | |
08/08/1995 | Call received | call from Relators will file a reply by 5 p.m. 08-08-95 call made to | | |
08/08/1995 | M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Overruled | M/L/F Pet Mand ovveruled; Motion for temporary relief also overruled. | |
08/08/1995 | Relator's reply brief on the merits | "Relator's surreply in further support of their petition for writ of Mandamus and application for emergency relief" | | |
08/07/1995 | Reply to Response | | | |
08/02/1995 | Motion for temporary relief | incorporated with m/l/f | | |
08/02/1995 | Exhibits received | | | |
08/02/1995 | Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus | motion for emergency relief incorporated | | |
08/02/1995 | Petition for writ received | and brief in support | | |
08/02/1995 | Request made for reply to proceeding | by Monday, August 7, 1995 @ 5pm | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
09/08/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored. | no Mo/Re filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO | Relator | Ms. Margaret A. Wilson |
BRAKE, BOB | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
KAMEN, HARRY P. | Relator | Mr. Marc J. Goldstein |
WHITE, ROBERT R. | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
CRIMMINS, ROBERT J. | Relator | Mr. David I. Goldblatt |
LYNCH, FRANK | Relator | Ms. Francine E. Menaker |
MANNING, TAMMY | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
GALLOWAY, TOM | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
GARLAND, DONALD R. | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
SAHNER, CHARLES | Relator | Ms. Anne Pike |
MANDEL, RICHARD | Relator | Ms. Anne Pike |
GLENDENNING, CHARLES R. | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
VINES, VINCE | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
CAPPS, HARLAN | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
CHANDLER, JERE | Relator | Ms. Anne Pike |
GUEST, WAYNE | Relator | Ms. Anne Pike |
ORTIZ, LUZ | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
RUDEL, CHAD | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
BYARS, JERRY | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
COOK, NICKY L. | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
BLAIR, DONALD R. | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
KRIEG, TIMOTHY | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
TROY, STEPHEN M. | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
HUTTO, JAMES R. | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
VAUGHN, NEIL | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
SCOTT, MARK | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
HARRISON, DAMON | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
SKIDMORE, EDDIE | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
ROSS, ROBERT | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
BRANTON, STEVEN F. | Relator | Honorable Randall W. Wilson Ms. Anne Pike |
JENKINS, RICHARD | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
MUCKLEROY, JOHN D. | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
MADDY, PAUL G. | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
KENDRICK, RICHARD D. | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
BOLEN, JOHN | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
HARPER, MIKE E. | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
MAY, CARY | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
PRALLE, ANGELA K. | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
LEE, SAMMY | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
JONES, JOHN DAVID | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
CULWELL, CHARLOTTE | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
LEWIS, MICHARL R. | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
PIERCE, GREG | Respondent | Mr. J. Craig Lewis |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-95-00603-CV
Grant
920 SW2d 720, 07-24-95
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
280th District Court
Harris
Honorable Tony Lindsay
94-54606