Case: 95-0723
95-0723
07/31/1995
App Writ of Error
NORTHPARK NATIONAL BANK OF DALLAS
DELWAX CORPORATION d/b/a NATURAL DRY OF DALLAS and d/b/a NATURAL DRY OF CHICAGO and FRED DELIN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/10/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/15/1995 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | Record in Clerk's office; petitioner Comerica Bank-Texas successor-in-interest Fed-X on 11-13-95 | |
09/08/1995 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
07/31/1995 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/10/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
01/17/1996 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | Mo/Re overruled | | |
12/22/1995 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Overruled | | |
11/15/1995 | Conditional motion for rehearing | No description available. | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
11/15/1995 | Motion for Rehearing | Record in Clerk's office; petitioner Comerica Bank-Texas successor-in-interest Fed-X on 11-13-95 | | |
11/15/1995 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | Record in Clerk's office | | |
11/14/1995 | Notice requesting filing fee | $10 Mo/Re (sent $75 check) | | |
10/27/1995 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | | |
09/08/1995 | Reply to Response | | | |
08/16/1995 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
07/31/1995 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
01/17/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Mo/Re overruled |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
SUCCESSOR; COMERICA BANK-TEXAS | Petitioner | Ms. Laura L. Worsham |
DELWAX CORPORATION | Respondent | Mr. Charles W. Sartain |
D/B/A NATURAL DRY OF DALLAS | Respondent | Mr. Charles W. Sartain |
NORTHPARK NATIONAL BANK/DALLAS | Petitioner | Ms. Lindy D. Jones |
D/B/A NATURAL DRY OF CHICAGO | Respondent | Mr. Charles W. Sartain |
DELIN, FRED O. | Respondent | Mr. Charles W. Sartain |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-94-00718-CV
Aff'd/Rev'd & Remanded
RULE 90, 05-09-95
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable WILL BARBER
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Joe B. Brown
92-15232-D