Case: 01-84-00765-CV
01-84-00765-CV
11/29/1984
Injunction
Likover, Sandford
Sunflower Terrace, Ltd.
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/10/1985 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
10/10/1985 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
08/22/1985 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
08/22/1985 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/10/1985 | Submitted | | |
05/10/1985 | Submission | | |
05/10/1985 | Submitted | | |
04/03/1985 | Submission | | |
03/22/1985 | Brief filed | | |
03/22/1985 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/22/1985 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/25/1985 | Brief filed | | |
01/25/1985 | Statement of facts filed | | |
01/24/1985 | No description available. | Grant motion | |
01/09/1985 | No description available. | | |
12/20/1984 | No description available. | Grant motion | |
12/13/1984 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
12/11/1984 | Response filed to a motion or to a Court order | | |
12/06/1984 | Filing fee paid | | |
12/04/1984 | Motion to Stay | | |
11/29/1984 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
11/29/1984 | Transcript filed | | |
11/29/1984 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
09/20/1984 | Appeal bond filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/10/1985 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Appellee | |
State | Appellant | |
State | Appellant |
Trial Court Information
333rd District Court
Harris
83-64,666