judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GALEANA (FELIPE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36216
Short Caption:GALEANA (FELIPE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39027
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C163075Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/05/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09359
06/19/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Christopher Oram shall file the transcript request form within 10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. 00-10449
07/26/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 24, 2000 and May 18, 2000. Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentin. 00-12927
07/31/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-13180
08/02/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The fast track statement and appendix shall be served and filed on or before August 10, 2000. 00-13333
08/14/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-14188
08/14/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-14189
08/28/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-15118
10/24/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-18769
11/21/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19406
11/21/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/22/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 27, 2000. 00-19406