judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DON PADOU, ET AL V. DC ALCOHOLIC BEV. CONT. BD.

Case Information: 10-AA-0793
Short Caption:DON PADOU, ET AL V. DC ALCOHOLIC BEV. CONT. BD.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Alcohol Beverage Control Board (ABC)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:09-081PFiled Date:07/02/2010

Opening Event Date:07/02/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/09/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/18/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/23/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/23/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDon Padou NPro SeN
PetitionerAbigail Padou NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Alcoholic Beverage Control BoardN
Todd S. KimNY
Donna M. MuraskyNY
Richard S. LoveYY
William P. Hager NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/02/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
07/02/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
07/02/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq.
08/09/2010FiledRECORD ON APPEAL W/10/7/09 hearing and 5/5/10 hearing
08/09/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/24/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
09/02/2010RESP MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD no oppo
09/02/2010RECEIVED- supplemental record
09/08/2010ORD GRANT RESP MO FOR LV TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD and the lodged documents are filed as a supplemental record. (JAC)
09/08/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (Index of records & newspaper article)
09/20/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
10/04/2010 On consideration of petitioner's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before November 3, 2010. (JAC)
10/26/2010RESP MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD no oppo (second) w/ blue note book
10/26/2010RECEIVED - Supplemental Record (Blue note book)
10/28/2010ORD GRANT RESP MO FOR LV TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD and the lodged documents are filed as a supplemental record. (JAC)
10/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 - (Blue notebook)
11/02/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 11/11/10
11/10/2010RECEIVED- petitioner's brief and appendix
11/23/2010 On consideration of petitioners' motion for for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged brief and appendix, it is ORDERED that petitioners' motion is granted and the lodged brief and appendix are filed. it is (MORE)
11/23/2010PETITIONER'S BRIEF
11/23/2010APPENDIX
11/23/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's brief shall be filed on or before December 15, 2010. (JAC) elp
12/15/2010RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 1/31/11
12/21/2010 On consideration of respondent's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that respondent's motion is granted and the brief of respondent shall be filed on or before January 31, 2011. (JAC)
01/28/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 2/4/11
02/04/2011RECEIVED - Resp brief.
02/04/2011RESP MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD
02/04/2011RECEIVED - supp record.
02/10/2011PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION to Resp's motion to supp the record for a second time.
02/16/2011RESPONDENT'S REPLY- to oppo to supplementing the record
02/18/2011ORDER GRANT RESP MOTION TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief. It is (MORE)
02/18/2011ORD GRANT RESP MO FOR LV TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD and the Clerk shall file the lodged documents as a supplemental record. It is F/O that this matter shall be scheduled before a merits division of this court as soon as the calendar permits. (ETW)
02/18/2011RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
02/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (Clean Hands Certifications, Citywide Clean Hands Compliance Status report & letter from ANC 5A)
02/18/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/24/2011PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF
04/12/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
05/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/16/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT
05/19/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT adn the parties are to be present in the District of Columbia Court of Appeals courtroom, located at 430 E Street, N.W., on the second floor, at 1:55 p.m. on June 23, 2011. (JAC)
06/23/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/23/2011FiledARGUED before Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Thompson, and Reid Don Padou, Pro Se for the PETITIONER Richard S. Love, Esq. for the RESPODANT
08/26/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Reid, Associate Judge, Retired.)
09/23/2011FiledMandate