Case: A-91
A-91
03/13/1944
Application for Writ of Error
LIZZIE BURGESS, ET VIR
FRANK SYLVESTER, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/05/1944 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
04/22/1944 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | | |
04/12/1944 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | | |
03/18/1944 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
03/13/1944 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/12/1944 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
06/05/1944 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
04/22/1944 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
04/12/1944 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
04/12/1944 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/12/1944 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
03/30/1944 | Motion to amend application for writ of error | Filing granted | | |
03/18/1944 | Response to Petition | | ||
03/13/1944 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
03/13/1944 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Lizzie Burgess, et vir | Petitioner | |
Frank Sylvester, et ux. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information