judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT E. HINCKS v. WALTON RANCH COMPANY, a Wyoming corporation,

Case Heading (06-111)
Case Number:06-111Case Docketed On:05/22/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Agriculture, Livestock and Other Animals (Title 11)
Short Title:ROBERT E. HINCKS v. WALTON RANCH COMPANY, a Wyoming corporation,
Full Title:ROBERT E. HINCKS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. WALTON RANCH COMPANY, a Wyoming corporation, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert E. HincksRichard J. Mulligan
Heather Noble
AppelleeWalton Ranch Company, a Wyoming corporationBradford S. Mead

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 112
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/22/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/22/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/22/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/22/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/05/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/14/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on cdBriefAppelleeFinal
09/08/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal. (Wrong month inadvertantly posted on send date.)Notice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/15/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume, Volume I, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/15/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/03/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/17/2006Event - Oral argument presented before full court (Heather Noble for appellant; Bradford S. Mead for appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
11/17/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/23/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/08/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal