Case: 05-03-01429-CR
05-03-01429-CR
09/29/2003
Capital Murder
Flores, Justin Michael
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/03/2019 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
10/02/2019 | Letter received | | |||
11/07/2005 | Mandate Issued | | |||
11/07/2005 | Mandate Issued | | |||
10/11/2005 | Record Returned | | |||
09/14/2005 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | | ||
06/22/2005 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |||
06/20/2005 | Record Shipped | | |||
06/14/2005 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |||
04/12/2005 | Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals | | |||
04/12/2005 | Ext to file Petition for Discretionary Review Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/30/2005 | Letter Received | | |||
03/24/2005 | Memorandum Opinion | Affirmed | | ||
03/24/2005 | Record Retention | Retain | | ||
03/24/2005 | Memorandum Opinion | Affirmed | | ||
03/23/2005 | Submission | | |||
03/23/2005 | Submitted | | |||
03/10/2005 | Reply Brief Due | | |||
03/09/2005 | Letter Brief or Quotations of Authority | | |||
02/23/2005 | Supplemental Brief Due | | |||
02/09/2005 | Case reinstated | | |||
02/09/2005 | Order Entered | Otherwise Disposed | | ||
02/09/2005 | Case reinstated | | |||
02/03/2005 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
01/12/2005 | Order Entered | Abated | | ||
01/12/2005 | Order Entered | Abated | | ||
01/11/2005 | Submitted | | |||
01/11/2005 | Submission | | |||
01/11/2005 | Submitted | | |||
01/03/2005 | Letter Filed | | |||
11/01/2004 | Submission | | |||
10/05/2004 | Brief Due | | |||
10/05/2004 | Brief Filed | | |||
10/05/2004 | Case ready to be set | | |||
10/05/2004 | Case ready to be set | | |||
09/01/2004 | Brief Due | | |||
08/31/2004 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/30/2004 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
08/01/2004 | Brief Filed | | |||
07/30/2004 | Brief Due | | |||
07/06/2004 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
06/29/2004 | Case reinstated | | |||
06/29/2004 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
06/29/2004 | Case reinstated | | |||
06/25/2004 | Findings of Fact & Conclusion of Law Filed | | |||
06/25/2004 | Supplemental Record Due | | |||
06/25/2004 | Supplemental Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
05/26/2004 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
05/26/2004 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
05/26/2004 | Order Entered | Abated | | ||
05/26/2004 | Order Entered | Abated | | ||
05/25/2004 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
05/08/2004 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
05/08/2004 | Brief Due | | |||
04/15/2004 | Supplemental Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
04/12/2004 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
04/09/2004 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
04/08/2004 | Brief Due | | |||
03/11/2004 | Response due | | |||
03/09/2004 | Case reinstated | | |||
03/09/2004 | Order Entered | Vacated | | ||
03/09/2004 | Case reinstated | | |||
03/05/2004 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
03/01/2004 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
02/22/2004 | Supplemental Record Due | | |||
01/30/2004 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
01/28/2004 | Extension on Reporter's Record | | |||
01/23/2004 | Order Entered | Abated | | ||
01/23/2004 | Order Entered | Abated | | ||
11/21/2003 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
11/10/2003 | Record due | | |||
10/06/2003 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||
09/30/2003 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |||
09/29/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
09/29/2003 | 25.2 Certification filed | | |||
09/29/2003 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
09/12/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
09/11/2003 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/07/2005 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Justin Michael Flores | Criminal - Appellant | J. Stephen Cooper |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | William T. (Bill) Hill, Jr. Kristin C. Hagge |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Dallas
Honorable John Creuzot
F03-71211-JK
Life