judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEVINGSTON (LULA) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36227
Short Caption:LEVINGSTON (LULA) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR9900586Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/06/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/06/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09524
06/19/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Frederick Olmstead shall file the transcript request form within 10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. 00-10458
07/21/2000MotionFiled Motion. 00-12653
08/08/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On July 21, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record. Because counsel for appellant has accepted a position with the Attorney General's office, the motion is granted. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing appellate counsel for appellant. If indigent, the district court shall have 30 days to appoint appellate counsel. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain appellate counsel and appellate counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from the appointment or appearance of appellate counsel, the district court shall: transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order; and (2) serve a copy of this order of remand on appellant counsel. Appellate counsel shall have 10 days to file a notice of appearance with the clerk of this court and shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 40 days of the appointment or appearance of appellate counsel. 00-13788
08/24/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on August 21, 2000, appointing Mary Lou Wilson as counsel for appellant. 00-14906
08/30/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Mary Lou Wilson advises the Honorable Court and the Clerk of the Court of the Notice of Appearance and acceptance of appointment in the above-entitled action. 00-15272
09/06/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Trial Monday, Tuesday, March 27, 28, 2000. Court Reporter: Judith Ann Schonlau. 00-15698
09/18/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-16428
09/18/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-16429
09/18/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave of Court to Permit Photographs to be sent to the Court for Fast Track Statement in order to assist in Determining Legal Issue Number 1. 00-16431
09/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of the district court is directed to forward the photographs for filing and consideration with the appendix. Exhibits 1, 2, 3, 5, 6, and 13. 00-16979
10/11/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-17988
10/11/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-17993
10/11/2000MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion to Transmit Exhibit, Specifically Audiotape. 00-17995
10/30/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court the audiotape, which was State's exhibit No. 9 at appellant's trial. 00-19111
02/21/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " . . . we affirm the judgment of conviction." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-03226
03/20/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Exhibits: Exhibits 1, 2, 3, 5, 6 and 13 (photographs); State's Exhibit 9 (audiotape) this day. 01-03364
03/20/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/29/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 28, 2001. 01-03364