judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LARRY STEVEN MURPHY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0804
Short Caption:LARRY STEVEN MURPHY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-14160-09Filed Date:06/28/2010

Opening Event Date:06/28/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/07/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/19/2012
Argued/Submitted:01/25/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/27/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLarry Steven Murphy YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Karen Shinskie NN
Lauren R. BatesYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/21/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (166 pgs/Richer) 4/12/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (196 pgs/Burr) 4/13/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (167-383 pgs/Richer) 4/14/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (383-453 pgs/Richer) 4/15/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (15 pgs/Johnson) 4/19/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (10 pgs/Johnson) 4/20/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (7 pgs/tape) 6/18/10 proc. w/cd
12/07/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/14/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/29/2010RECORD INDEX
12/29/2010RECORD COPIES
01/24/2011'PPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 90 days no oppo
01/28/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 25, 2011. (JAC)
04/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo)
04/27/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 25, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (Castillo)
07/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 10/24/11.
10/24/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/03/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 11/23/11.
11/18/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/18/2011FiledAppendix (Attached to brief) (Appellant)
12/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
12/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 1/19/12.
01/19/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
01/19/2012FiledBriefing Completed
02/10/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
03/27/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
04/05/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
04/09/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/02/2012FiledMemorandum - Lauren Bates will argue in place of Karen Shinskie (Appellee)
10/15/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/18/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
10/18/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
10/31/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
11/15/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
12/03/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/25/2013FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Fisher, Oberly
01/30/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman, Fisher, and Oberly, Associate Judges.)
02/11/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc. (Appellant)Granted
02/13/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension of time to file a petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc to March 15, 2013.
03/27/2013FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith.
03/27/2013FiledMandate
05/01/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)