judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

LOMA VISTA DEVELOPMENT COMPANY v. THOMAS W. JOHNSON, ET UX.

Case: A-81
A-81
03/01/1944
Application for Writ of Error
LOMA VISTA DEVELOPMENT COMPANY
THOMAS W. JOHNSON, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/06/1944Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
05/30/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/05/1944Response to Brief filedPetitioner
04/03/1944Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
04/03/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
03/01/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
03/01/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/31/1944Letter Filed
06/06/1944Brief in Support of Petition
06/05/1944Response to Motion filed
05/30/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/05/1944Response to Brief filed
04/03/1944Brief in Support of Petition
04/03/1944Response to Petition
03/29/1944Bond
03/15/1944Document received (See Remarks)
03/01/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/01/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Thomas W. Johnson, et ux.Respondent
Loma Vista Development CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information