judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ZARAGOZA VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36226
Short Caption:ZARAGOZA VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A399643Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/06/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
06/06/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 00-09512
06/06/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
06/13/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of Eric H. Woods--check no. 030709.
06/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Judgment: "We deny the petition." -NNP99B-CY/DA/ML. 00-11253
07/03/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. 00-11291
07/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On July 3, 2000, petitioners filed a notice by which they "withdraw their PETITION FOR A WRIT OF PROHIBITION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE WRIT OF MANDATE" filed in this matter on June 6, 2000. This court having denied the petition in an order entered on June 30, 2000, no action will be taken with regard to the July 3, 2000 notice. 00-12910
07/25/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-12911
07/25/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.