judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID P. FLORES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0803
Short Caption:DAVID P. FLORES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-21590-08Filed Date:06/28/2010

Opening Event Date:06/28/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/01/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/07/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/30/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/13/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid P. Flores Y
Joseph A. VirgilioNY
Deborah A. PersicoYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Katherine M. KellyYY
John P. MannarinoNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Joseph Virgilio, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/20/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Joseph Virgilio, Esquire
08/12/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
08/13/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (189 pgs/Gilliam) 3/16-18/10 proc CD attached (115A C4)
08/24/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (14 pgs/tape) 9/29/08 proc.
08/26/2010RECORD INDEX
08/26/2010RECORD COPIES
09/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (7 pgs/Tape - 6/11/10 proc.)(w/CD attached)
09/01/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ) For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
10/12/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 12/30/10. no oppo
10/19/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before December 30, 2010. (JAC)
12/30/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/30/2010APPENDIX
02/01/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 3/7/11. no oppo
02/07/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before March 7, 2011. (JAC)
03/07/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/07/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/22/2011FiledFinal Screening-Regular
04/14/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of June 2011 through Sept 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by APR. 22, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
04/22/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
09/13/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
09/15/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
09/19/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
09/22/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/28/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File to file reply brief. (Appellant)
10/28/2011LodgedReply Brief (Appellant)
11/04/2011FiledAppearance by Atty Persico (Appellant)
11/14/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
11/14/2011FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
11/30/2011FiledArgued Before Judge Fisher, Blackburne-Rigsby, Newman Deborah A. Persico, Esq. for Appellant Katherine M. Kelly, Esq. for Appellee
12/22/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher, Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Newman, Senior Judge.)
01/13/2012FiledMandate
01/19/2012FiledMotion To Publish (Appellee)Granted
02/08/2012FiledOrder Granting aple's motion to publish.
02/23/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Newman, Senior Judge.)
04/19/2012FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)