Case: 05-85-00878-CV
05-85-00878-CV
08/05/1985
Mandamus
Walter Wallgren
Harlan Martin, Judge, 192nd Dist. Court of Dallas County, Tx
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/19/2019 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
05/30/2019 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
06/05/1997 | Case Destroyed | | |||
05/29/1997 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||
11/08/1985 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/08/1985 | Opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
10/03/1985 | Letter Filed | | |||
09/30/1985 | Motion Regarding Court's Jurisdiction | | |||
09/23/1985 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |||
09/20/1985 | Brief Filed | | |||
09/20/1985 | MattConv | | |||
09/17/1985 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/03/1985 | Response to Motion | | |||
08/30/1985 | Brief Filed | | |||
08/30/1985 | Exhibits Filed | | |||
08/30/1985 | MattConv | | |||
08/30/1985 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |||
08/28/1985 | Motion to Postpone Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/15/1985 | MattConv | | |||
08/09/1985 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/06/1985 | MattConv | | |||
08/05/1985 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||
08/05/1985 | MattConv | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/19/2019 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
192nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 192nd District Court
85-1328-K