judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRUTOS (JOSEPH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36234
Short Caption:FRUTOS (JOSEPH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0000358CClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/08/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/08/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-09704
06/13/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: April 4 and 5, 2000. Court Reporter: Julietta Forbes. 00-09999
06/13/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: May 4 and 5, 2000. Court Reporter: Julietta Forbes. 00-10007
07/17/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-12324
08/07/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-13689
08/16/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Counsel for respondent shall file and serve the fast track response within 20 days of the date of this order or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. 00-14288
09/05/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-15619
09/05/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-15620
10/24/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contention and concluded that it is without merit, " . . . we affirm the judgment of conviction." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-18771
11/21/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19407
11/21/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 22, 2000. 00-19407