judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM PENN APARTMENTS LP, ET AL V. JOHN S. SCHERLIS, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-0814
Short Caption:WILLIAM PENN APARTMENTS LP, ET AL V. JOHN S. SCHERLIS, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead:10-CV-0814Consolidated: 10-CV-0866
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB6144-08Filed Date:06/23/2010

Opening Event Date:06/23/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/30/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam Penn Apartments LpN
Patricia M. ThorntonNN
AppellantCafritz CompanyN
Patricia M. ThorntonNN
AppelleeJohn S. Scherlis N
AppelleeWilliam L. Scherlis N

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/23/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/02/2010 ORDERED that appellants shall w/20 days from the date of this oder SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL and NON-APPEALABLE order... (BY: ETW)
08/02/2010TMC - OTSC
09/09/2010 ORDERED, that the AUGUST 2, 2010 OTSC IS HEREBY DISCHARGED. It is ****MORE*****
09/09/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE IS GRANTED and APPEAL NOS 10CV814 & 10CV866 are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. It is *****MORE****
09/09/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEES' MOTION FOR LEAVE IS GRANTED and the Clerk shal file the lodged memorandum. It is *****MORE*****
09/09/2010MISCELLANEOUS-APPELLEES' MEMO ON THE ISSUES WHETHER THE COURT HAS JURISDICTION
09/09/2010 FURTHER ORDERED, SS, that THESE APPEALS ARE REMANDED TO THE TRIAL COURT for further action and upon entry of an order that resolves all matters in the consolidation, if any party remains aggrieved, they may file a NOA. It is *****MORE*****
09/09/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STAY IS DENIED AS MOOT. (BY: ETW) lw
09/13/2010RECEIVED - aplt's reponse to motion to file memorandum on the issue of whether the Court has jurisdiction to entertain appeals.
09/30/2010MANDATE ISSUED
10/01/2010RECEIVED - aplt's response to Show Cause ord (sent next day air 8/20/10--not recvd by DCCA until 10/1/10)
04/18/2014FiledArchived