judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SUNSHINE CUSTOM PAINTS & BODY, INC., a Wyoming corporation; CYCLONE DRILLING, INC., a Wyoming corporation; and M & J SERVICES, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. SOUTH DOUGLAS HIGHWAY WATER AND SEWER DISTRICT, a governmental unit of the State of Wyoming; and THE CITY OF GILLETTE, WYOMING, a Municipal Corporation and a City of the First Class

Case Heading (06-115)
Case Number:06-115Case Docketed On:05/25/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Counties (Title 18)
Short Title:SUNSHINE CUSTOM PAINTS & BODY, INC., a Wyoming corporation; CYCLONE DRILLING, INC., a Wyoming corporation; and M & J SERVICES, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. SOUTH DOUGLAS HIGHWAY WATER AND SEWER DISTRICT, a governmental unit of the State of Wyoming; and THE CITY OF GILLETTE, WYOMING, a Municipal Corporation and a City of the First Class
Full Title:SUNSHINE CUSTOM PAINTS & BODY, INC., a Wyoming corporation; CYCLONE DRILLING, INC., a Wyoming corporation; and M & J SERVICES, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. SOUTH DOUGLAS HIGHWAY WATER AND SEWER DISTRICT, a governmental unit of the State of Wyoming; and THE CITY OF GILLETTE, WYOMING, a Municipal Corporation and a City of the First Class, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSunshine Custom Paints & Body, Inc.Tad T. Daly
AppellantCyclone Drilling, Inc.Tad T. Daly
AppellantM & J Services, Inc.Tad T. Daly
AppelleeSouth Douglas Highway Water and Sewer DistrictJames L. Edwards
AppelleeThe City of GilletteJudith A. W. Studer
Charles Anderson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/25/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/25/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/25/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/25/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/31/2006Event - Phone Call to counsel for City of Gillette regarding counterclaim. He indicated that it is still an ongoing claim and they intend to file a motion to dismiss this appealEventPhone CallFinal
06/01/2006Motion - Dismiss - involuntary by City of GilletteMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
06/05/2006Motion - Dismiss - involuntary, combined motion to dismiss and memorandum in support of motionMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
06/15/2006Response/Objection - Motion to dismiss from City of Gillette and South Douglas Highway Water and Sewer DistrictResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
06/20/2006Order - Dismiss - involuntary for lack of compliance with W.R.C.P. 54(b)OrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
07/06/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal